IL HB2353 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning construction of the Code.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |