IL HB2382 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the amendatory Act shall constitute an irrevocable continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary for the implementation the Department of State Police's Division of Forensic Services and the irrevocable and continuing authority for the Department and the State Treasurer to make the necessary transfers for that purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
ST POLICE-FORENSIC SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2382&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2382.htm |