IL HB2383 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person convicted of a violation of the provisions of the Code governing the right-of-way at crosswalks and in school zones that resulted in a Type A injury to another shall have his or her driving privileges suspended for 12 months. Provides that the Act may referred to as Mason's Law. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-RIGHT OF WAY-HARM/DEATH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0470 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1002.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-909 | New Code | See Bill Text |