IL HB2413 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption, provides that the assessor and the county recorder of deeds shall establish a policy and practice for the regular exchange of information for the purpose of alerting the assessor whenever a transfer of ownership of any property receiving a Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption has occurred. Provides that, if such a transfer occurs, the assessor shall mail a notice to the new owner of the property (i) informing the new owner that the exemption will remain in place through the year of the transfer, after which it will be cancelled, and (ii) providing information pertaining to the rules for reapplying for the exemption if the homeowner qualifies. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2413&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2413.htm |