IL HB2430 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable years 2019 and thereafter, the maximum reduction for the senior citizens homestead exemption is $8,000 in all counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-08-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-07-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2430&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2430.htm |