IL HB2435 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Provides that a health insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or other managed care entity for a health care plan and its employees and other representatives are liable for damages for harm to an enrollee proximately caused by their failure to exercise ordinary care. Prohibits a health insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or other managed care entity from removing a provider from its health care plan for advocating on behalf of an enrollee for appropriate and medically necessary health care. Prohibits a health insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or other managed care entity from entering into a contract with a provider that indemnifies the health insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or other managed care entity. Provides that an insured or enrollee seeking damages has the right and duty to submit the claim to arbitration in accordance with the Uniform Arbitration Act. Provides that the provisions do not apply to workers' compensation insurance coverage, actions seeking only a review of an adverse utilization review determination, and licensed insurance agents.
Title
PATIENT RIGHTS-LIABILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2435&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2435.htm |