IL HB2438 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning mental and emotional disorders, provides that "mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorder or condition" includes any mental health condition that occurs during pregnancy or during the postpartum period and includes, but is not limited to, postpartum depression. Effective immediately.
Title
MATERNAL MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0386 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Remains in Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Health Care Licenses Committee; 002-004-001 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 24.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 65-31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 95 | 7.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |