IL HB2451 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Removes a birthdate restriction on eligibility at age 55 for a 3% automatic annual increase in retirement annuity that is not subject to a maximum increase of 30%. Makes a related change. Adds provisions concerning calculations of annual increases in retirement annuities of annuitants who retire after September 1, 1967. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHI FIRE-ANNUAL INCREASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-01-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-014-001 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 008-003-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-001 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 6-164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |