IL HB2455 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Works Jobs Program Act to require appointments to the Illinois Works Review Panel to be made within 30 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 101st General Assembly. Requires the Panel to hold its first meeting within 45 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 101st General Assembly. Amends the Chicago Police and Chicago Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. In provisions concerning eligibility for ordinary death benefits and certain annuities related to death in the line of duty, provides that the death of any fireman or policeman as a result of the exposure to and contraction of COVID-19, as evidenced by either (i) a confirmed positive laboratory test for COVID-19 or COVID-19 antibodies or (ii) a confirmed diagnosis of COVID-19 from a licensed medical professional, shall be rebuttably presumed to have been contracted while in the performance of an act or acts of duty and the fireman or policeman shall be rebuttably presumed to have been fatally injured while in active service. Specifies that the presumption shall apply to any fireman or policeman who contracted COVID-19 on or after March 9, 2020 and on or before December 31, 2020; except that the presumption shall not apply if the policeman or fireman was on a leave of absence from his or her employment for a period of 14 or more consecutive days immediately prior to the date of contraction of COVID-19. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Amends the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act with respect to claims related to COVID-19. Provides that there is a rebuttable presumption that an employee's contraction of COVID-19 arises out of and in the course of the employee's first responder or front-line worker employment and that the injury or occupational disease shall be rebuttably presumed to be causally connected to the hazards or exposures of the employee's first responder or front-line worker employment. Defines terms. Makes changes in the maximum weekly benefit amount. Makes changes with respect to the state experience factor and applicable contribution rate surcharges. Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Authorizes the payment of extended benefits for weeks beginning on or after March 15, 2020, through the end of the fourth week prior to the last week for which federal sharing is provided as authorized by Section 4105 of Public Law 116-127, or any amendments thereto. Provides that benefit limits do not include Federal Pandemic Unemployment Compensation amounts provided for in Section 2104 of Public Law 116-136. Eliminates the waiting period in certain circumstances. Provides for retroactive application. Effective immediately.
Title
SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS OPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-06-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0633 |
2020-06-05 | House | Effective Date June 5, 2020 |
2020-06-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2020-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2020-05-22 | House | House Concurs |
2020-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 113-002-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-05-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2020-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-004-000 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020 |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Financial Institutions |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 80 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |