IL HB2460 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Sustainable Investing Act. Provides that any public agency or governmental unit shall develop, publish, and implement sustainable investment policies applicable to the management of all public funds under its control. Provides that the sustainable investment policy may be incorporated in existing investment policies developed, published, and implemented by a public agency or governmental unit. Provides that the sustainable investment policy shall include material, relevant, and decision-useful sustainability factors to be applied by the public agency or governmental unit in evaluating investment decisions. Provides that a public agency shall prudently integrate sustainability factors into its investment decision-making, investment analysis, portfolio construction, due diligence, and investment ownership in order to maximize anticipated financial returns, minimize projected risk, and more effectively execute its fiduciary duty. Specifies sustainability factors, and the ways in which such factors may be analyzed. Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act, the Public Funds Investment Act, and the Illinois Pension Code to make changes concerning investment policy and the Illinois Sustainable Investing Act. Provides findings and purpose provisions. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUSTAINABLE INVESTING ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0473
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-042-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-004-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 006-003-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-046-000
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-15HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-004-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1552022.8Amended CodeCitation Text
302352.5Amended CodeCitation Text
4051-113.17New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2460&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0473.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2460sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2460_04042019_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2460_05232019_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2460sam001_05292019_038000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback