IL HB2472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the bill as introduced and expands the scope to apply to services as well as products that cause or contribute to injuries. Effective immediately.
Title
PRODUCT LIABILITY EXCEPTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0025 |
2019-06-21 | House | Effective Date June 21, 2019 |
2019-06-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-001 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-003-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-27 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 10b | Amended Code | Citation Text |