IL HB2486 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Mental Health Modernization and Access Improvement Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to apply for a Medicaid waiver or State Plan amendment, or both, within 6 months after the effective date of the Act to develop and implement a regulatory framework that allows, incentivizes, and fosters payment reform models for all Medicaid community mental health services provided by community mental health centers or behavioral health clinics. Requires the regulatory framework to: (i) allow for and incentivize service innovation that is aimed at producing the best health outcomes for Medicaid enrollees with mental health conditions; (ii) reward high-quality care through annual incentive payments to community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics; (iii) require community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics to report on specified quality and outcomes metrics; and other matters. Provides that all documentation and reporting requirements under the regulatory framework must comply with the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008 and the State mental health parity requirements under the Illinois Insurance Code. Contains provisions concerning quality and outcomes metrics reporting; data sharing; the establishment of a Stakeholder Quality and Outcomes Metrics Development Working Group; statewide in-person trainings to ensure provider readiness for the regulatory framework; quality and patient safety protections; implementation timeline; certification of community mental health centers that opt into the regulatory framework; and other matters. Provides that the Act shall be implemented upon federal approval and only to the extent that federal financial participation is available. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL HLTH MODERNIZATION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback