IL HB2487 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Task Force on Human Services Contracting Act. Modifies the appointment of members to the Task Force on State Contracting with Private Nonprofit Human Service Providers. Provides, among other appointments, that 7 (currently, 6) members shall be appointed by the Senate Minority Leader and 7 (currently, 6) members shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a preliminary report to the Auditor General, the General Assembly, and the Governor no later than October 1, 2020 (currently, October 1, 2019), and a final report, along with recommendations and any proposed legislation, to the General Assembly and the Governor by January 1, 2021 (currently, January 1, 2020). Dissolves the Task Force and repeals the Act on January 1, 2022 (currently, January 1, 2021). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE CONTRACTING TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0092
2019-07-19HouseEffective Date July 19, 2019
2019-07-19HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20514010Amended CodeCitation Text
20514015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback