IL HB2492 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of decals for Universal special license plates by the International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers and its Local Lodge 701. Provides fees for the issuance of the decals. Creates the Guide Dogs of America Fund and the Mechanics Local 701 Training Fund as special funds in the State treasury. Makes corresponding changes in the State Finance Act.
Title
VEH CD-IAM UNION DOGS DECALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0256 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.893 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |