IL HB2496 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Allows licensed health care professionals (rather than just physicians) to make certain disability determinations. Defines "licensed health care professional". Requires a licensed health care professional to submit his or her registration number on all reports submitted to the System. Eliminates the 12-month application deadline for certain disability benefits. Makes changes to provisions concerning when a nonoccupational disability benefit begins to accrue. Also makes changes relating to Social Security full retirement age and to hearings under certain provisions of the Workers' Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Makes a technical change. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2017-08-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-031-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-005-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-103.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-123.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-124.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |