IL HB2498 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Reduces the rate of tax on diapers and baby wipes to 1% (currently, 6.25%), changing the distribution of the proceeds from the tax imposed on diapers and baby wipes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TAX-DIAPERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-06HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback