IL HB2500 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that objections to a petition to expunge or seal must be filed within 30 days (rather than 60 days) of the date of service of the petition.
Title
SEAL OR EXPUNGE-OBJECTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |