IL HB2512 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that, no later than July 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, each public university must submit a report to the Board of Higher Education on the amount of tuition that undergraduate, degree-seeking students attending the university paid in the previous academic year that includes (i) the percentage of undergraduate students who paid more than 75% of full tuition costs, (ii) the percentage of undergraduate students who paid more than 50% but no more than 75% of full tuition costs, (iii) the percentage of undergraduate students who paid more than 25% but no more than 50% of full tuition costs, (iv) the percentage of undergraduate students who paid no more than 25% of full tuition costs, and (v) the percentage of undergraduate students who had no tuition costs. Provides that the tuition costs calculated must reflect the amount of tuition paid by a student after all scholarships, grants, and other financial assistance have been applied to his or her tuition charge and must reflect only the amounts paid by undergraduate, degree-seeking students. Requires the Board of Higher Education to annually compile and submit, as part of its tuition and fee waiver report to the General Assembly, the information received by each public university.
Title
HIGHER ED-TUITION REPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0093 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |