IL HB2513 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the county clerk of a county where a decedent last resided shall (rather than may) issue certifications of death records from the electronic reporting system for death registrations and shall (rather than may) use that system to cancel the registration of any person who has died during the preceding month. Requires a county coroner, medical examiner, or physician for a county or any other individual responsible for certification of death under the Vital Records Act to promptly transmit certified records to the county clerk within 7 days after the death. Requires the county clerk and coroner to report quarterly to its affiliated county board and certify its full compliance with the provisions and accuracy of the voter rolls. Allows an individual to request a copy of the county clerk's or coroner's report and allows for relief if the county clerk fails to provide an accurate report within specified timeframes.
Title
ELEC CODE-DECEASED VOTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2513&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2513.htm |