IL HB2522 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Legislative Accessibility Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall make all efforts to increase public accessibility to the General Assembly, and specifies the efforts to be included. Provides that the Secretary of State shall make all efforts to increase public accessibility to all State buildings. Provides specified accessibility requirements for the State Capitol Building and the James R. Thompson Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA & ST BUILDING-ACCESSIBILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback