IL HB2523 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall rescind the suspension or cancellation of a person's driver's license that has been suspended or canceled prior to the effective date due to specified violations. Provides that, in the case of a license suspended before the effective date due to the person failing to pay any fine or penalty due or owing as a result of 10 or more violations of local standing, parking, or compliance regulations, a local government shall, within 120 days of receiving a list of persons whose licenses have been suspended before the effective date provided by the Secretary of State, provide the person with notice of a right to a hearing. Provides that an individual subject to suspension who has received a notice may, within 45 days of receiving the notice, request a hearing. Provides that, upon individual request, the local government shall conduct a financial hardship hearing before suspension of a license for unpaid fines or penalties. Prescribes requirements for notice and factors to be considered for a determination of financial hardship. Provides that, if an individual qualifies for a payment plan and makes timely payments, the government may not pursue other means to collect on the debt, and, if the individual misses a payment, may, after providing 60 days' written notice, pursue collection of the debt. Provides that a fourth missed payment shall be considered noncompliance. Provides that, if the individual does not appear at the pre-suspension hearing, the hearing officer may find the person in default and provide notice of the determination. Provides that an individual subject to suspension as a result of 10 or more violations of a vehicular standing, parking, or compliance regulation established by ordinance after a hearing officer's determination that the individual is in a financial hardship is not entitled to another financial hardship hearing.
Title
VEH CD-VIOLATION COMPLIANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-001-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-209.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |