IL HB2524 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2020, the Department of Children and Family Services shall increase reimbursement rates payable to each private agency with a purchase of service contract or grant from the Department to an amount that equals the sum of all increases in general inflation during State Fiscal Years 2014 through 2018 as determined by the consumer price index-u published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor, less any rate increases, previously provided by the Department. Sets forth the types of services eligible for the increased reimbursement rate, including, (i) residential services, (ii) specialized, adolescent, treatment, or other non-traditional or Home-of-Relative foster care services, and (iii) intact family services. Provides that beginning in State Fiscal Year 2020, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, the Department shall implement the rate reimbursement methodology outlined in a specified provision of the Illinois Administrative Code when calculating and determining the payment rates for private agencies that contract with the Department to provide specified services. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2021, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, foster parent rates and payment rates for other specified services shall be adjusted each year to an amount that equals any increase in general inflation as determined by the consumer price index-u. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-PAYMENT RATE INCREASES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-22HouseTo Wages & Rates Subcommittee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055fNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback