IL HB2533 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Transportation Benefit Program Act. Provides that an employer that is situated in Cook County and for which an average of 20 or more full-time employees work for compensation shall offer a program that allows a covered employee to elect to exclude from taxable wages and compensation the employee's commuting costs incurred for the purchase of a transit pass to use public transit up to a maximum level allowed by federal tax law. Provides that a covered employer may comply by participating in a program offered by the Chicago Transit Authority or the Regional Transit Authority. Provides that all transit agencies shall market the existence of the program to their riders. Establishes penalties for violations of the Act. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Transportation Benefits Program Fund. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
TRANSPORTATION BENEFIT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | To Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2533&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2533.htm |