IL HB2540 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Blockchain Business Development Act. Provides for the creation and regulation of personal information protection companies. Provides for the creation and regulation of blockchain-based limited liability companies as businesses that utilize blockchain technology for a material portion of their business activities. Provides for a public record blockchain study and report. Provides for a blockchain insurance and banking study and report. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to incorporate into one or more of its economic development marketing and business support programs, events, and activities topics concerning blockchain technology and financial technology. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLOCKCHAIN BUS DEVELOPMENT ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0259
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date June 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-30HouseArrived in House
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2019-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-20HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-20HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-002-000
2019-02-27HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2540&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0259.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2540sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2540_04112019_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2540_05302019_053000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2540sam001_06012019_022000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback