IL HB2544 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hotel Employee Safety Act. Provides that each hotel shall equip an employee who is assigned to work in a guest room or restroom, under circumstances where no other employee is present in the room, with a panic button or notification device. Provides that the employee may use the panic button or notification device to summon help if the employee reasonably believes that an ongoing crime, sexual harassment, sexual assault, or other emergency is occurring in the employee's presence. Provides that the panic button or notification device shall be provided by the hotel at no cost to the employee. Provides that each hotel shall develop, maintain, and comply with a written anti-sexual harassment policy containing specified content to protect employees against sexual assault and sexual harassment by guests. Provides that each hotel shall provide all employees with a current copy in English, Spanish, and Polish of the hotel's anti-sexual harassment policy, and post the policy in English, Spanish, and Polish in conspicuous places in areas of the hotel where employees can reasonably be expected to see it. Provides that it is a violation of the Act for a hotel to retaliate against an employee for reasonably using a panic button or notification device; availing himself or herself of certain anti-sexual harassment policy provisions; or disclosing, reporting, or testifying about any violation of the Act or any rule adopted under the Act. Provides that a complaint alleging a violation shall be filed by the aggrieved party with the Department of Human Rights no later than 180 days after the occurrence of the alleged violation and in accordance with rules adopted by the Department. Provides that investigations to enforce specified provisions of the Act shall be conducted by the Department. Provides that a hotel that violates the Act or any rule adopted under the Act shall be subject to a fine of not less than $250 and not more than $500 for each offense. Makes a corresponding change in the Illinois Human Rights Act.
Title
HOTEL PANIC BUTTONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-06 | House | To Business and Industry Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 6-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2544&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2544.htm |