IL HB2562 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Defender and Appointed Counsel Division of the Counties Code. Creates the Public Defender Quality Defense Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is established to: (i) examine the current caseload and determine the optimal caseload for public defenders in the State; (ii) examine the quality of legal services being offered to defendants by public defenders of the State; and (iii) make recommendations to improve the caseload of public defenders and quality of legal services offered by public defenders. Provides that the Task Force shall hold a minimum of 2 public hearings and at other times of its choosing. Provides that the Task Force shall prepare a report that summarizes its work and makes recommendations resulting from its study to the General Assembly and Governor no later than December 31, 2020. Repeals the provisions on December 31, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC DEFENDER-TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-001-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |