IL HB2574 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that any person required to file a federal Form 1099 with respect to a nonresident who performed services within the State during the taxable year shall file a copy of that form with the Department of Revenue. Provides that a third-party settlement organization that is required to file an information return under certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code shall, within 30 days of the date the filing is due to the Internal Revenue Service, file a duplicate return with the Department of Revenue. Provides that third-party network transactions are subject to the $600 de minimis reporting requirements set forth in the Internal Revenue Code, rather than the de minimis reporting requirements otherwise applicable to third-party settlement organizations under the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
INC TX-THIRD-PARTY REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |