IL HB2577 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Excludes manufacturers and importing distributors that in the preceding year had less than $50,000 of tax liability under the Taxation of Liquor Article from a provision requiring manufacturers and importing distributors to file a specified bond with the Department of Revenue. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-BOND REQUIREMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0037
2019-07-03HouseEffective Date July 3, 2019
2019-07-03HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-001
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23558-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback