IL HB2583 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the River Conservancy Districts Act. Provides that territory that may be added to a river conservancy district includes a part of a county or an entire county or counties. Requires notice of a public hearing regarding the addition of territory in each county in which the additional territory is located. Provides that a petition to expand a conservancy district may include a new name of the expanded district. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSERVANCY DIST-EXPANSIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0476 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |