IL HB2591 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Requires denial to an applicant for admission to a certified academy or decertification of a full-time or part-time police officer if the person has entered a plea guilty to (currently, only convicted of) a felony or certain specified misdemeanor offenses. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board's investigators are peace officers and have all the powers possessed by policemen in cities and by sheriff's, and these investigators may exercise those powers anywhere in the State. Provides that an investigator shall not have peace officer status or exercise police powers unless he or she successfully completes the basic police training course mandated and approved by the Board or the Board waives the training requirement by reason of the investigator's prior law enforcement experience, training, or both. Provides that the Board shall not waive the training requirement unless the investigator has had a minimum of 5 years experience as a sworn officer of a local, State, or federal law enforcement agency. Provides that any hiring agency that fails to train a law enforcement officer within this period shall be prohibited from employing this individual in a law enforcement capacity for one year from the date training was to be completed. Provides that if an agency again fails to train the individual a second time, the agency shall be permanently barred from employing this individual in a law enforcement capacity. Makes conforming and technical changes.
Title
POLICE TRAINING-CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0187 |
2019-08-02 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |