IL HB2601 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Property Conservation Rights Act. Provides that a conservation right may be amended or modified from time to time only by a written instrument executed by the grantor and grantee and recorded with the office of the recorder of deeds of the county in which the land is located. Provides that either party may, in the absolute discretion of the party, withhold consent to any amendment or modification requested by the other party. Provides that an amendment or modification shall not materially and adversely affect the conservation purposes of the conservation right or facilitate the extinguishment of the conservation right. Provides that the consent of any party other than the grantor and grantee is not required for amendment or modification, even if the other party is entitled to enforce an easement. Provides that the conservation right may contain other requirements for amendment or modification, and such other requirements shall control. Provides that a unit of local government has the authority to grant a conservation right on property that it owns to another unit of government or to a not-for-profit corporation or trust that meets certain criteria. Provides that an action to enforce a conservation right may be brought by any party entitled to enforce the conservation right against a nonowner who is violating the terms of the conservation right. Provides that a notice of violation may be recorded by the holder of the conservation right against any property that the holder of the conservation right reasonably determines is in violation of the conservation right. Provides that a conservation right shall not be extinguished by adverse possession, a claim of abandonment, or merger, and may be extinguished only by such procedure as may be set forth in the conservation right or by a release of the conservation right in accordance with the terms of the conservation right. Provides that no prescriptive easement shall be established that adversely impacts the conservation values protected by the conservation right. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY-CONSERVATION RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0142 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-27 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 120 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 120 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |