IL HB2620 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Permits offenders subject to the truth in sentencing provisions of the Code to earn sentence credit for good conduct in specific instances as the Director of Corrections deems proper. Permits offenders subject to the truth in sentencing provisions of the Code to earn sentence credit for educational, vocational, substance abuse, behavior modification programs, life skills courses, re-entry planning, and correctional industry programs. Provides that sentence credit earned shall not reduce the sentence of the prisoner to less than: (1) 75% (rather than 85%) of his or her sentence if the prisoner is required to serve 85% of his or her sentence; and (2) 90% of his or her sentence if the prisoner is required to serve 100% of his or her sentence. Makes conforming changes.
Title
CD CORR-SENTENCE CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |