IL HB2625 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Circuit Courts Act. Provides that in 2021, the General Assembly shall redraw the boundaries of the subcircuits of the Circuit of Cook County to reflect the results of the 2020 federal decennial census. Provides that a resident judgeship assigned to a subcircuit shall continue to be assigned to that subcircuit. Provides that any vacancy in a resident judgeship existing on or occurring after the effective date of a law redrawing the boundaries of the subcircuits shall be filled by a resident of the redrawn subcircuit.
Title
CIR COURTS-COOK SUBCIRCUITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0477 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 066-046-002 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 052-045-014 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-019-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-004-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-012-003 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-27 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 35 | 2f | Amended Code | Citation Text |