IL HB2647 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal promotion Act. Expands the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Zone to include Alsip, Blue Island, Burnham, Calumet city, Calumet park, Chicago Heights, Country Club Hills, Crestwood, Flossmoor, Ford Heights, Glenwood, Lansing, Lynwood, Matteson, Midlothian, Oak Forest, Olympia Fields, Orland Hills, Orland Park, Park Forest, Richton Park, Robbins, Sauk Village, South Chicago Heights, Steger, Tinley Park, University Park, Worth. Extends the life of the South Suburban Brownfields redevelopment fund to accommodate development agreements extend through 2026 (currently 2021).
Title
SOUTH SUB BROWNFIELDS REDEVELP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 607 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 607 | 3-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2647&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2647.htm |