IL HB2649 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employee Classification Act. Includes an individual within the scope of the term "contractor". Provides for notice to an employer of violations and penalties and for a time within which an employer may request a hearing; provides for a formal administrative hearing. Makes changes concerning responsibilities of the Attorney General and the recovery of penalties. Includes discipline within acts prohibited as retaliation against a person for exercising rights under the Act, and adds provisions concerning review, an investigation, and a formal hearing. Provides for individual officers and agents of employers to be liable under the Act.
Title
EMPLOY-CLASSIFICATION-PENALTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0106 |
2013-07-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 067-049-001 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-007-000 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-020-001 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2013 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor and Commerce; 010-004-000 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-04-16 | House | Verified |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-045-001 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-006-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 185 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 185 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 185 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 185 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 185 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 185 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |