IL HB2656 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Feminine Hygiene Products For The Homeless Act. Provides that feminine hygiene products, including, but not limited to, sanitary napkins, tampons, and panty liners, shall be available free of charge at all homeless shelters that provide temporary housing assistance to women or youth.
Title
HOMELESS-MENSTRUAL PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-002 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |