IL HB2667 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Creates a small and mid-sized business enterprise initiative program. Provides that the program shall apply to construction contracts and contracts for goods and services by the Department of Transportation and Capital Development Board. Establishes a race and gender-neutral program to increase small and mid-sized business participation in those contracts. Allows the applicable chief procurement officer to set aside certain contracts for exclusive participation of small and mid-sized businesses. Sets forth reporting requirements and penalties for violations of the provisions. Allows the Department of Central Management Services to adopt rules to implement the program. Includes severability provisions.
Title
PRO-SMALL BUSINESS INITIATIVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | To Government Process Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2667&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2667.htm |