IL HB2669 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language requiring registration of certain farm wagon type trailers having a fertilizer spreader attachment and farm wagon type tank trailers. Removes the registration fee and existing width and weight restrictions for single unit self-propelled agricultural fertilizer implements.
Title
VEH CD-FARM MACHINERY FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0481 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |