IL HB2670 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Defines "mitigating factors" for the purposes of provisions concerning the licensure, certification, or registration of applicants with criminal convictions. Provides that mitigating factors are not a bar to licensure, instead they provide guidance for the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation when considering licensure, registration, or certification for an applicant with criminal history. Provides that the Department, upon a finding that an applicant for a license, certificate, or registration was previously convicted of a felony or misdemeanor that may be grounds for refusing to issue a license or certificate or to grant a registration, shall consider the circumstances surrounding the offense or offenses. Provides that the Department shall consider any mitigating factors from the point of arrest or indictment when determined to be appropriate. Makes other changes.
Title
NEW BUSINESS OWNER ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0388 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-042-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |