IL HB2671 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to establish a credit program where certain contractors may receive credit applicable to meeting the requirements of the Act based on their utilization of minority owned businesses and female owned businesses. Requires the Department to review the program annually. Sets forth requirements of the program.
Title
MINORITY BUSINESS-CREDIT PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | To Government Process Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2671&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2671.htm |