IL HB2676 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes that include the following. Specifies the number of hours of education required in certain advanced areas specific to public health dentistry and requires that the training program for a public health dental hygienist include a minimum of 29 hours of didactic study in those areas (instead of a minimum of 26 hours of didactic study). Provides that the education in advanced areas specific to public health dentistry may be provided by a statewide dental hygiene association that meets certain requirements. Provides that the didactic study may be taken in compliance with specified continued learning education requirements. Provides that the training program for a public health dental hygienist must require completion of 5 hours of didactic courses in the topic areas of special needs dentistry, teledentistry, nutritional needs of geriatric and low income patients, communication techniques with non-English speaking patients, cultural competency, and professional ethics. Provides that the training program must require completion of an 8 hour in-person classroom review (instead of classroom experience) that includes a comprehension exam on specified topics (instead of an outcome assessment examination) and submit certification of successful completion to the supervising dentist. Removes a requirement that the training program require the hygienist to complete an 8-hour, on-site mentoring experience monitored by the dentist who will have a public health supervision agreement with the hygienist. Makes grammatical and other changes.
Title
PUBLIC HEALTH DENTAL HYGIENIST
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0064 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 25 | 13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 25 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |