IL HB2682 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a cocktail or mixed drink placed in a sealed container by a retail licensee at the retail licensee's location may be transferred and sold for off-premises consumption if specified requirements are met. Prohibits third-party delivery services from delivering cocktails or mixed drinks. Prohibits the delivery or carry out of cocktails or mixed drinks under specified conditions. Repeals the provisions concerning transferring cocktails for off-premises consumption one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act. For a liquor license holder whose business or business operations have been suspended in any capacity due to any executive order issued on or after March 16, 2020 or any subsequent rule established by the Department of Public Health or any other agency of the State as a result of COVID-19: provides that late filing fees shall not apply for a specified period; authorizes the deferral of liquor license fees for a specified period; and provides that the renewal of the liquor license shall be automatically approved and the license shall be extended for a specified period. Provides that a retail licensee shall not be deemed to be delinquent in payment until 30 days after the date on which the region in which the retail licensee is located enters Phase 4 of the Governor's Restore Illinois Plan as issued on May 5, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
AVIATION FUEL TAX
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0631 |
2020-06-02 | House | Effective Date June 2, 2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2020-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2020-05-23 | House | House Concurs |
2020-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 104-006-000 |
2020-05-23 | House | Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule by Voice Vote |
2020-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend House Rule(s) for Immediate Consideration Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2020-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2020-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feignholtz |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020 |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 108-001-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-12 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |