IL HB2689 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Requires the Authority to produce a monthly Pretrial Order Report, Pretrial Bail Proceeds Report, and Pretrial Custody and Release Report. Specifies requirements for these reports. Provides that the Authority shall post each county's monthly Pretrial Order Report, Pretrial Custody and Release Report, and Pretrial Bail Proceeds Report on the Authority's website on a monthly basis and those reports shall remain on the website for at least 5 years after being posted. Amends the Counties Code and the Clerk of Courts Act to require certain reporting requirements. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ICJIA-PRETRIAL REPORTING
Sponsors
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3930 | 7.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-6041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-6042 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-6403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 105 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 105 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2689&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2689.htm |