IL HB2691 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Makes changes to the legislative findings. Provides that a student who is an Illinois resident and who is not otherwise eligible for federal financial aid, including, but not limited to, a transgender student who is disqualified for failure to register for selective service or a noncitizen student who has not obtained lawful permanent residence, shall be eligible for State financial aid and benefits. Provides that, to ensure equity, success, and the retention of Illinois residents, a student who is an Illinois resident may not be subject to any caps on grant assistance available under the Monetary Award Program other than those required by State law. Provides that the eligibility requirements for any student aid or benefit funded or administered by the State shall be interpreted to promote the broadest eligibility for students who are Illinois residents in accordance with State law or policy. Makes other changes.
Title
RETENTION OF IL STUDENTS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0021 |
2019-06-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-06-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-015-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-002-000 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 066-047-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |