IL HB2693 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Act. Changes the name of the Act and Authority to the Metropolitan Public Exposition Authority Act and the Metropolitan Public Exposition Authority. Provides that the Authority may enter into installment payments contracts or lease purchase agreements for specified purposes. Limits the applicability of provisions concerning persons engaged in the business of providing ground transportation and livery vehicles. Requires imposition of a $1 occupation tax on specified persons engaged in the business of providing a transportation network service in the metropolitan area at the McCormick Square campus or a commercial service airport. Increases specified bonding authority of the Authority from $2,850,000,000 to $3,450,000,000. Increases the minimum contract amount requiring a contract to be competitively bid or require a request for proposal. Makes other changes relating to minority-owned, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses and contractors, contracts for professional services, and contracts entered into pursuant to the Governmental Joint Purchasing Act. Amends various Acts, Laws, and Codes making conforming changes concerning the Act's title and Authority's name. Amends the State Finance Act, Use Tax Act, Service Use Tax Act, Service Occupation Tax Act, and Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Increases the amounts that may be deposited into the McCormick Place Expansion Project Fund through the year 2036 (currently, through 2032), allowing for increases each fiscal year thereafter that bonds are outstanding, but not after fiscal year 2070 (currently, 2060). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

METRO PUBLIC EXPOSITION AUTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-15Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.25Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.25fAmended CodeCitation Text
303552Amended CodeCitation Text
3053-1Amended CodeCitation Text
307501-3Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text
3513029Amended CodeCitation Text
351453Amended CodeCitation Text
351456Amended CodeCitation Text
54204A-101Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.3-6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-13Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-14Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-14aAmended CodeCitation Text
7015601Amended CodeCitation Text
7015602Amended CodeCitation Text
702101Amended CodeCitation Text
7021010.3New CodeSee Bill Text
7021013Amended CodeCitation Text
7021013.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7021013.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7021014Amended CodeCitation Text
702102Amended CodeCitation Text
7021023.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7021024Amended CodeCitation Text
7021025.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7021025.4Amended CodeCitation Text
702103Amended CodeCitation Text
702105Amended CodeCitation Text
702105.4Amended CodeCitation Text
702152Amended CodeCitation Text
702153Amended CodeCitation Text
702158Amended CodeCitation Text
70320519Amended CodeCitation Text
7050840Amended CodeCitation Text
705208Amended CodeCitation Text
705252008Amended CodeCitation Text
705308Amended CodeCitation Text
705358Amended CodeCitation Text
7353010-5-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7353015-5-15Amended CodeCitation Text
7353020-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text
7353025-7-103.27Amended CodeCitation Text
73557-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73557-103Amended CodeCitation Text
73557-103.27Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback