IL HB2700 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that if in any case an error is made in billing a TRS benefit recipient, the Department of Central Management Services shall identify the error and refund the overpaid amount as soon as practicable. Provides that a TRS benefit recipient who has overpaid shall be entitled to a refund of overpayments for up to 7 years of past payments.
Title
ST HEALTH BENEFIT RECIPIENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0483 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |