IL HB2708 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with these changes. Provides that the law enforcement agency may attempt to gather at the time of the missing person report: (1) a DNA sample of the missing person; and (2) a DNA reference sample created from family members DNA samples for submission to the Department of State Police or a National Missing and Unidentified Persons System (NamUs) partner laboratory. Provides that if the person identified in the missing person report remains missing after 30 days, but not more than 60 days, the law enforcement agency may generate a report of the missing person within NamUs, and the law enforcement agency may attempt to obtain the additional information and materials that have not been received. Provides that the law enforcement agency may attempt to obtain a DNA sample from the missing person or a DNA reference sample created from family members DNA samples for submission to the Department of State Police or a NamUs partner laboratory. Provides that samples collected for DNA analysis may be submitted to a NamUs partner laboratory or other resource where DNA profiles are entered into local, State, and national DNA Index Systems within 60 days (rather than immediately submitted to the Department of State Police for analysis). Provides that the responsible law enforcement agency may make a NamUs report on the missing person within 60 days after the report of the disappearance of the missing person. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
MISSING PERSON DNA SYSTEM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0266 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2021 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 4 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Muñoz |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-016-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 722 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 722 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |