IL HB2713 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act, the State Finance Act, and the Public Utilities Act. Provides that this Act may be referred to as the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Act. Authorizes the procurement of renewable energy credits by electric utilities serving more than 300,000 retail customers as of January 1, 2019. Provides for the renewable energy credits to be related to new renewable energy resources installed at the site of electric generation that on January 1, 2019 burned coal as the primary fuel source. Provides for the Illinois Power Agency to manage the procurement of the credits. Establishes the requirements for eligibility for the credits. Requires the electric utilities to file a tariff for the billing and collection of a Coal to Solar Energy Storage Initiative Charge on each kilowatthour of electricity delivered to its delivery services customers within its service territory at specified rates and to deposit a percentage of its collections in the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Incentive and Plant Transition Fund. Establishes the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Incentive and Plant Transition Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to provide transitional support funding to coal-fueled electric utilities participating in the utilization of the renewable energy credits. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY EFFICIENCY MEASURES
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 825-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |