IL HB2719 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, in addition to any other requirements under the Code, as a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma, the parent or guardian of each student or, if a student is at least 18 years of age or legally emancipated, the student must (i) file a Free Application for Federal Student Aid with the United States Department of Education or, if applicable, an application for State financial aid or (ii) on a form created by the State Board of Education, file a waiver with the student's school district indicating that the parent or guardian or, if applicable, the student understands what the Free Application for Federal Student Aid and application for State financial aid are and has chosen not to file an application. Provides that a school district must require each high school student to comply with the requirements and must provide to each student and, if applicable, his or her parent or guardian any support or assistance necessary for compliance. Provides that a school district must award a high school diploma to a student who is unable to meet the requirements due to extenuating circumstances, as determined by the school district, if (i) the student has met all other graduation requirements under the Code and (ii) the principal attests that the school district has made a good faith effort to assist the student or, if applicable, his or her parent or guardian in filing an application or a waiver. Allows the State Board to adopt rules.
Title
HGHER ED-DIVERSE FACULTY GRANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0180 |
2019-08-02 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-039-001 |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-013-001 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-002-001 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 930 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |