IL HB2735 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Renews the program for incentive periods beginning on or after July 1, 2018 and ending on or before June 30, 2025. Removes language concerning the Put Illinois to Work Program for the second series of incentive periods. Provides that the term "full-time employee" means an individual who is employed for a basic wage for at least 35 hours each week (currently, employed for a basic wage for at least 35 hours each week or renders any other standard of service generally accepted by industry custom or practice as full-time employment). Provides that a net increase in the number of full-time Illinois employees shall be treated as continuous if a different new employee is hired as a replacement within 8 weeks after the position becomes vacant (currently, a reasonable time). Effective immediately.
Title
SMALL BUSINESS TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 25 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |